CA AB123 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 476, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 51008 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pupil instruction: social sciences: farm labor movement:

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB123 Bonta By Lara (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 123 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-10-02 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 476, Statutes of 2013.
2013-10-02 Approved by the Governor.
2013-09-25AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2013-09-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2013-09-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 2245.).
2013-09-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-08-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2013-07-01SenateIn committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2013-06-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-06-13SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2013-05-29SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 1717.)
2013-05-28AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-04-10AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2013-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-04-02AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2013-04-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 20).
2013-01-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2013-01-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 14.
2013-01-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code51008Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code51221.2New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_123&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_123_bill_20130114_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_123_bill_20130402_amended_asm_v98.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_123_bill_20130402_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_123_bill_20130524_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_123_bill_20130114_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_123_bill_20130402_amended_asm_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_123_bill_20130524_amended_asm_v97.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_123_bill_20130912_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_123_bill_20131002_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_123_vote_20130320_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_123_vote_20130524_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_123_vote_20130529_1151AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_123_vote_20130619_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_123_vote_20130701_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_123_vote_20130830_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_123_vote_20130909_0327PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback