CA AB1228 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 533, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 533, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1203.2 of, and to add Section 1203.25 to, the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
Supervised persons: release.
Sponsors
Asm. Alex Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-10 - Assembly - AB 1228 Lee Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 48 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1228 Lee By Cortese (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1228 Lee Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 20 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1228 Lee By Cortese (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1228 Lee Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 20 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 533, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-22 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2021-09-10 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 48. Noes 22. Page 3112.). |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 2534.). |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26). |
2021-07-15 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 1721.) (June 29). |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 20. Page 1849.) |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20). |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 20). |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1203.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1203.25 | New Code | See Bill Text |