CA AB1223 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 585, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 10261.7 to the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Construction contract payments: Internet Web site posting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-13 - Assembly - AB 1223 CABALLERO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1223 Caballero By Cannella (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1223 CABALLERO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 585, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-21AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2017-09-13AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 3303.).
2017-09-13AssemblyAssembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Page 3254.)
2017-09-12AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-09-11SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2706.).
2017-09-06SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-05SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-08-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-08-21SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-07-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-05SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2017-06-20SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2017-06-08SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2017-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 1794.)
2017-05-18AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-17AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 17).
2017-05-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2017-04-18AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-04-17AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 5).
2017-03-28AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2017-03-27AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-09AssemblyReferred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and L. GOV.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Contract Code10261.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Contract Code20104.60New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback