CA AB1223 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 379, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 379, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 1797.120 and 1797.225 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to emergency medical services.
Title
Emergency medical services: ambulance transportation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-02 - Assembly - AB 1223 O'DONNELL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1223 O'Donnell By Pan (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1223 O'DONNELL Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1223 O'Donnell By Pan (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1223 O'DONNELL Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 379, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-16 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-02 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2774.). |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2729.) |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2293.). |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-07-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1595.) |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (May 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1797.120 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1797.220 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1797.225 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1797.98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |