CA AB1220 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 398, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 398, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 50210 and 50216 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 8255, 8256, 8257, and 8260 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to state government.
Title
Homelessness: California Interagency Council on Homelessness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-10 - Assembly - AB 1220 Luz Rivas Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1220 Luz Rivas et al. By Caballero (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - AB 1220 Luz Rivas Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1220 Luz Rivas et al. By Caballero (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - AB 1220 Luz Rivas Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 398, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-22 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2021-09-10 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3155.). |
2021-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2021-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2619.). |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-31 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 22). |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Action rescinded whereby the bill was referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S., HOUSING and JUD. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1471.) |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 12). |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 29). |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 50210 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50216 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 8255 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 8256 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 8257 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 8260 | Amended Code | Citation Text |