CA AB1220 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 71, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 71, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 52 of the Metropolitan Water District Act (Chapter 209 of the Statutes of 1969), relating to metropolitan water districts.
Title
Metropolitan water districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1220 Cristina Garcia By Bradford (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1220 Cristina Garcia Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1220 Cristina Garcia Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 71, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-07-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | Enrolled measure version corrected. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1819.). |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1480.) |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |