CA AB1220 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 65009, 65589.3, and 65755 of the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
Land use and planning: cause of actions: time
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-08 - Assembly - AB 1220 ALEJO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 49 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1220 Alejo By DeSaulnier (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Assembly - AB 1220 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1220 Alejo By DeSaulnier (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Assembly - AB 1220 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-09 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2011-09-22 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m. | |
2011-09-08 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 3138.). | |
2011-09-08 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 2397.). | |
2011-09-06 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-09-02 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-06-16 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-06-15 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 14). | |
2011-05-31 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-05-26 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2011-05-12 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-12 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 26. Page 1343.) | |
2011-05-09 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-05 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (May 4). | |
2011-04-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2011-04-25 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65009 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65589.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65755 | Amended Code | Citation Text |