CA AB1219 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 676, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 302, 303.3, 305, 6821, 10704, 11320, 11322, 11323, 13105, 13200, 13202, 13203, 13206.5, 13208, 13209, 13210, 13211, 13211.5, 13212, 13213, 13214, 13233, 14286, 14443, 15210, and 15360 of, to add Section 11322.5 to, to repeal Sections 13216.5, 13260, 13261, 13262, 13263, 13264, 13265, 13266, 13267, and 15211 of, and to repeal and add Sections 301, 303, 13204, 13206, 13216, 14284, and 14285 of, the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections: ballots.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1219 Berman Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1219 Berman By Stern (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1219 Berman Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 676, Statutes of 2023.
2023-10-10 Approved by the Governor.
2023-09-15 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2023-09-11AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3181.).
2023-09-07AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3011.)
2023-09-06AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2023-09-06SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2426.).
2023-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-09-01SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2023-06-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-06-26SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2023-06-12SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-06-08SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 6).
2023-05-30SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2023-05-17SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2023-05-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2023-05-04AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1462.)
2023-04-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2023-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
2023-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-03-30AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2023-03-29AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 29).
2023-03-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
2023-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2023-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code10704Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code11320Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code11322Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code11322.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Elections Code11323Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13105Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13200Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13202Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13203Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13206.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13208Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13209Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13210Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13211Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13211.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13212Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13213Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13214Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13216.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13233Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13260Repealed CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13261Repealed CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13262Repealed CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13263Repealed CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13264Repealed CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13265Repealed CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13266Repealed CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13267Repealed CodeCitation Text
Elections Code14286Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code14443Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code15210Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code15211Repealed CodeCitation Text
Elections Code15360Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code302Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code303.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code305Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code6821Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1219
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1219#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1219#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1219#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1219#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1219#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1219#94ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1219#93CHP
Roll Callhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1219

Bill Comments

feedback