CA AB1219 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 782, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 782, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 44230.5, 44253.10, 44253.11, and 44258.3 of, to add and repeal Section 44258.10 of, and to repeal and add Section 44258.9 of, the Education Code, relating to teacher credentialing.
Title
Teacher credentialing: certificated employee assignment monitoring.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 1219 Jones-Sawyer Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1219 Jones-Sawyer By Durazo (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1219 Jones-Sawyer Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1219 Jones-Sawyer By Durazo (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1219 Jones-Sawyer Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 782, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3491.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 2855.). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2019-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-31 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 2127.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 16). |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (March 27). |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 44230.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44253.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44253.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44258.10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44258.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |