CA AB1216 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 23648 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Corporation Tax Law: credit: employment.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Choi [R] | Asm. Sebastian Ridley-Thomas [D] | Asm. Dante Acosta [R] | Sen. Tom Berryhill [R] |
Asm. Rocky Chavez [R] | Asm. James Gallagher [R] | Asm. Marie Waldron [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.48 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23648 | New Code | See Bill Text |