CA AB1215 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 66205.2 to the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.
Title
Public postsecondary education: University of California: admissions policy: systemwide protocols.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1215 Boerner Horvath et a By Leyva (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1215 Boerner Horvath Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1215 Boerner Horvath Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2021-10-08 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2021-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2345.). |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | From special consent calendar. |
2021-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-07-05 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1858.) |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1685.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66205.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |