CA AB1215 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 5.8 (commencing with Section 11549.30) to Part 1 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to open government.
Title
California Open Data Standard.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Privacy and Consumer Protection (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Privacy and Consumer Protection (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and P. & C.P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11549.30 | New Code | See Bill Text |