CA AB1214 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-14 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 712 of, and to repeal and add Section 709 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile proceedings: competency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-08 - Assembly - AB 1214 STONE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-14SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-05-14SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-05-10SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-05-18SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2017-05-08SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1428.)
2017-05-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-05-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 2).
2017-03-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-03-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-27AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure263.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1942.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code709New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code712Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback