CA AB121 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 30505, 30524.5, 31751.4, and 31764.5 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to public animal shelters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public animal shelters: adoptions: military service members.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2021-02-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2021-01-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2021-01-11AssemblyRead first time.
2020-12-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 18.
2020-12-18AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback