CA AB1209 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 2810.6 to the Labor Code, relating to wages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employers: gender pay differentials.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1209 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 47 N: 23 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1209 Gonzalez Fletcher By Galgiani (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1209 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 19 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-15 Vetoed by Governor.
2017-09-19AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-09-11AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 47. Noes 23. Page 3142.).
2017-09-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-09-07SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 2574.).
2017-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-09-01SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
2017-08-21SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-13SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-12SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 12).
2017-07-05SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2017-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 19. Page 1967.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-30AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (May 26).
2017-05-10AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. & E.
2017-03-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-27AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code218.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code2810.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code2810.7New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback