CA AB1207 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Part 8 (commencing with Section 122500) of Division 105 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pathways Through Pandemics Task Force.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-08 - Assembly - AB 1207 Akilah Weber Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1207 Akilah Weber et al. By Rubio (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1207 Akilah Weber Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-03AssemblyConsideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
2022-01-03AssemblyConsideration of Governor's veto pending.
2021-10-04AssemblyVetoed by Governor.
2021-09-15 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2021-09-08AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.).
2021-09-08AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 42. Noes 13.)
2021-09-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-09-07SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.).
2021-09-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-09-01SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-09-01SenateOrdered to third reading.
2021-09-01SenateFrom special consent calendar.
2021-08-31SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2021-08-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
2021-08-16SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-07-06SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-05SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 30).
2021-06-16SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-06-07SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-06-03AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2021-06-01AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
2021-05-05AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-22AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2021-04-21AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 20).
2021-03-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-03-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-02-22AssemblyRead first time.
2021-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2021-02-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code122500Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB1207
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB1207#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB1207#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB1207#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB1207#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB1207#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB1207#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB1207#93ENR
Roll Callhttp://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB1207

Bill Comments

feedback