CA AB1206 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 531, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 531, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 22659.6 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: impoundment: pilot program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1206 BOCANEGRA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1206 Bocanegra By Pan (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1206 BOCANEGRA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1206 Bocanegra By Pan (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1206 BOCANEGRA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 531, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 3100.). |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 2460.). |
2017-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-29 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 11). |
2017-06-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 1381.) |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 25). |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 22659.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 22659.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |