CA AB1205 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 267, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 267, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 77925 and 77935 of, and to add Section 78007 to, the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to the California Cut Flower Commission.
Title
California Cut Flower Commission: membership: reconvening commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-27 - Assembly - AB 1205 Limón Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1205 Limón By Caballero (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Assembly - AB 1205 Limón Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1205 Limón By Caballero (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Assembly - AB 1205 Limón Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 267, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5251.). |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4295.). |
2020-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2020-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-07 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3942.) |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 23). |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 77925 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 77935 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 78007 | New Code | See Bill Text |