CA AB1205 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 473, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 473, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 130232 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority: contracting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1205 Jones-Sawyer Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1205 Jones-Sawyer By Allen (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1205 RIDLEY-THOMAS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1205 Jones-Sawyer By Allen (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1205 RIDLEY-THOMAS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 473, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 31). |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 4. Page 5803.). |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (May 15). |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator McGuire. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1621.) |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 130232 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 30142 | Amended Code | Citation Text |