CA AB1205 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 473, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 130232 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority: contracting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1205 Jones-Sawyer Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1205 Jones-Sawyer By Allen (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1205 RIDLEY-THOMAS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-18 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 473, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-18 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-11AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2018-08-31AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-31AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 31).
2018-08-31AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
2018-08-28AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2018-08-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-27SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 4. Page 5803.).
2018-08-21SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-20SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-13SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (May 15).
2018-03-15SenateRe-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-03-05SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-09-11SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
2017-09-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-08SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-09-08SenateOrdered to second reading.
2017-09-08SenateFrom inactive file.
2017-07-17SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator McGuire.
2017-07-06SenateOrdered to third reading.
2017-07-06SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2017-06-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-06-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28).
2017-06-01SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-05-18SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-18AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1621.)
2017-05-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-05-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 8).
2017-03-09AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code130232Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code30142Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback