CA AB1204 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 751, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 127345 of, and to add Article 3 (commencing with Section 127370) to Chapter 2 of Part 2 of Division 107 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to hospitals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hospital equity reporting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 1204 WICKS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1204 Wicks et al. By Leyva (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1204 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 18 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 751, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-09 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-20 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2021-09-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 19.).
2021-09-09AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended.
2021-09-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2021-09-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9.).
2021-09-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-09-03SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-31SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-30SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
2021-08-16SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-07-08SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-07SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (July 7).
2021-06-09SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-06-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 18.)
2021-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20).
2021-05-05AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-26AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-04-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-15AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2021-04-14AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 13).
2021-04-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-04-05AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-02-22AssemblyRead first time.
2021-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2021-02-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code127345Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code127370New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback