CA AB1201 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 504, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 504, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 42356, 42356.1, and 42357 of, and to amend the heading of Chapter 5.7 (commencing with Section 42355) of Part 3 of Division 30 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.
Title
Solid waste: products: labeling: compostability and biodegradability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 1201 TING Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1201 Ting et al. By Allen (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1201 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1201 Ting et al. By Allen (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1201 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 504, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3072.). |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3063.) |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 2. Page 2567.). |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-23 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2021-08-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1685.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 24). |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 42356 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42356.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42357 | Amended Code | Citation Text |