CA AB1200 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 503, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 503, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 15 (commencing with Section 109000) to Part 3 of Division 104 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to product safety.
Title
Plant-based food packaging: cookware: hazardous chemicals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-07 - Assembly - AB 1200 Ting Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2021-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1200 Ting et al. By Allen (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - AB 1200 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1200 Ting et al. By Allen (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - AB 1200 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 503, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 2848.). |
2021-09-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0.). |
2021-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-07-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 7). |
2021-06-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 23). |
2021-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and E.Q. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 14. Page 1149.) |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 7). |
2021-03-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2021-03-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 109000 | New Code | See Bill Text |