CA AB12 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Passed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 509, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 11019.7 of the Government Code, relating to state government, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal information: social security numbers: the Employment Development Department.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB12 Seyarto et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - AB 12 Seyarto Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Insurance] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-05 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 509, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-05 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-07 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2021-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-08-30SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
2021-08-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-07-15SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-06-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 1715.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-06-03SenateReferred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
2021-05-20SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-20AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-13AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-05-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 12).
2021-04-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on INS. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on INS.
2021-03-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2021-03-24AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
2021-01-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and INS.
2020-12-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
2020-12-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code11019.7Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback