CA AB12 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 724, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 18109, 18120, 18160, 18170, 18175, 18180, 18185, 18190, and 18197 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms: gun violence restraining orders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-10 - Assembly - AB 12 Irwin Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 59 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB12 Irwin et al. By Stern (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - AB 12 Irwin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 13 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 724, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-11 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-18AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-10AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 15. Page 3289.).
2019-09-10AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3252.)
2019-09-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 2708.).
2019-09-06SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-05SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 30).
2019-07-08SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-06-19SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-18SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 18).
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
2019-04-08SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-04-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 13. Page 1075.)
2019-04-02AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-01AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-03-28AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 26).
2019-03-19AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-03-14AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-03-13AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-12AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-02-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-02-15AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2019-02-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-12-04AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
2018-12-03AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code18109New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code18120Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code18160Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code18170Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code18175Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code18180Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code18185Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code18190Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code18197Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback