CA AB1197 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 340, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 340, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 21080.27 of the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: exemption: City of Los Angeles: supportive housing and emergency shelters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1197 Santiago Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1197 Santiago et al. By Hertzberg Urgency Clause (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1197 Santiago Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1197 Santiago et al. By Hertzberg Urgency Clause (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1197 Santiago Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 340, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3415.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.) |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2751.). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2014.) |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 15). |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.) |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | (pending re-referral to Com. on H. & C.D.) |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 1150.) |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and H. & C.D. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21080.27 | New Code | See Bill Text |