CA AB1196 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 272, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 272, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 102100.3, 102100.6, and 102100.10 of, to add Section 102105.2 to, and to repeal Sections 102105.1 and 102206 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Sacramento Regional Transit District: board of directors: voting procedures.
Sponsors
Asm. Ken Cooley [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1196 Cooley By Pan (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - AB 1196 Cooley Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - AB 1196 Cooley Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 272, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-01 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2116.). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 1539.) |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 5). |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 102100.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 102100.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 102100.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 102105.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 102105.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 102206 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |