CA AB1195 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 892, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 892, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 19057.1 and 19242.2 of the Government Code, relating to employment.
Title
Limited Eligibility and Appointment Program: lists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1195 Cristina Garcia Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1195 Cristina Garcia By Cortese (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1195 Cristina Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1195 Cristina Garcia By Cortese (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1195 Cristina Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 892, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 1.). |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 31). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5059.). |
2022-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-17 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-06-09 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q., GOV. & F. and N.R. & W. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 19. Page 1648.) |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20). |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1460.) |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and E.S. & T.M. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 19057.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19242.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |