CA AB1195 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 38567.5 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases.
Title
California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006: Low-Carbon Fuel Standard regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-10 - Assembly - AB 1195 O'Donnell Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Date (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1195 O'Donnell By Umberg (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1195 O'Donnell By Umberg Reconsider (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1195 O'Donnell By Umberg (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1195 O'Donnell Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Date (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1195 O'Donnell By Umberg (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1195 O'Donnell By Umberg Reconsider (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1195 O'Donnell By Umberg (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1195 O'Donnell Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2019-10-11 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 14. Page 3245.). |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 6. Page 2589.). |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2589.) |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Motion to reconsider made by Senator Umberg. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 2569.). |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on EQ. and TRANS. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 5. Page 1780.) |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 15). |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.) |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 8). |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 38567.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |