CA AB1192 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 48000 and 48000.1 of the Education Code, relating to kindergarten.
Title
Kindergarten: admission: transitional kindergarten: professional development requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1192 McCarty Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1192 McCarty Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-01 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2023-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-07-14 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 12). |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 16. Page 2135.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (May 18). |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 26). |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-03-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 48000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 48000.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |