CA AB1191 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 25304 and 25364 of the Public Resources Code, relating to energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energy: assessments and forecasts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Transportation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-03AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2014-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2013-05-24AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
2013-05-15AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2013-04-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-04-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2013-04-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2013-03-21AssemblyReferred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2013-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2013-02-24AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
2013-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code25301Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code25304Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code25364Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback