CA AB1191 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 142, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 25660 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverages: proof of age: passports.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-07-13 - Assembly - AB 1191 CONWAY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-09 - Senate - Special Consent #12 AB1191 Conway (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1191 CONWAY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-08-06 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 142, Statutes of 2009.
2009-08-05 Approved by the Governor.
2009-07-30 Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
2009-07-13 Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2473.)
2009-07-09 In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2009-07-09 Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1665.)
2009-07-02 Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
2009-06-29 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-06-28 Read third time, amended. To second reading.
2009-06-24 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-06-23 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 23).
2009-06-04 Referred to Com. on G.O.
2009-05-18 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2009-05-18 Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 1548.)
2009-05-12 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-05-11 Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file.
2009-05-04 From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 30).
2009-03-31 Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2009-03-27 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
2009-03-26 Referred to Com. on G.O.
2009-03-02 Read first time.
2009-03-01 From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
2009-02-27 Introduced. To print.

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1191&sess=0910&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1191_bill_20090227_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1191_bill_20090327_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1191_bill_20090628_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1191_bill_20090715_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1191_bill_20090806_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1191_vote_20090430_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1191_vote_20090518_1252PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1191_vote_20090623_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1191_vote_20090709_0950AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1191_vote_20090713_1235PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback