CA AB1190 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
Pending: Assembly Privacy and Consumer Protection Committee
Hearing: Apr 23 @ 1:30 pm in State Capitol, Room 126
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 831.7 and 853.5 of, to add Section 831.7.2 to, and to add Chapter 12.97 (commencing with Section 7105) to Division 7 of Title 1 of, the Government Code, relating to unmanned aircraft.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unmanned aircraft: state and local regulation: limitations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD.
2019-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2019-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code7105New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code831.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code831.7.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code853.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback