CA AB1189 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 642, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 240306 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Riverside County Transportation Commission: transactions and use tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-07 - Assembly - AB 1189 GARCIA, E. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 50 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1189 Eduardo Garcia By Beall (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Assembly - AB 1189 GARCIA, E. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 642, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-10 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-13AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2017-09-07AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 3021.).
2017-09-05AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-09-05SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 2459.).
2017-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-08-29SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-06-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-06-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 28).
2017-06-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-05-10SenateReferred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
2017-04-20SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-04-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 1137.)
2017-04-17AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 5).
2017-03-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2017-03-16AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-09AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code240306Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback