CA AB1188 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 557, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 557, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 2987.2, 4984.75, and 4996.65 of, and to add Section 4999.121 to, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 128454 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health professions development, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Health professions development: loan repayment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1188 Nazarian By Hill Urgency Clause (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1188 NAZARIAN Third Reading Urgency (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1188 NAZARIAN Third Reading Urgency (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 557, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 7. Page 2561.). |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (September 1). |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and HEALTH. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 1940.). |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 26). |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 4). |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2987.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4984.75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4996.65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4999.121 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 128454 | Amended Code | Citation Text |