CA AB1185 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 342, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 25303.7 to the Government Code, relating to counties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County board of supervisors: sheriff oversight.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1185 McCarty Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 47 N: 21 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1185 McCarty et al. By Mitchell (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1185 McCarty Assembly Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 23 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 342, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-14AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2020-08-31AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 47. Noes 21.).
2020-08-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-08-28SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11.).
2020-07-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-07-28SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-06-12SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-11SenateOrdered to second reading.
2020-06-11SenateFrom inactive file.
2019-09-09SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
2019-07-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-07-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 2).
2019-06-12SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 23. Page 2128.)
2019-04-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 2).
2019-03-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2019-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code25303.7New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback