CA AB1185 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-27 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-27 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1939.23 of, and to add Section 1939.02 to, the Civil Code, and to amend Section 27365 of the Vehicle Code, relating to rental passenger vehicles.
Title
Rental passenger vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 1185 O'DONNELL Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1490.) |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 2). |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 28). |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and P. & C.P. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1939.02 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 1939.23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 27365 | Amended Code | Citation Text |