CA AB1184 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 190, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 56.05 and 56.35 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 56.107 of, the Civil Code, and to amend Section 791.02 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 791.29 of, the Insurance Code, relating to medical information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical information: confidentiality.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 1184 Chiu Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1184 Chiu et al. By Leyva (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Assembly - AB 1184 Chiu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-22 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 190, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-22 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-20 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2021-09-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 14. Page 2996.).
2021-09-08AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2021-09-08SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 2486.).
2021-09-01SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-31SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-16SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2021-07-15SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-14SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 13).
2021-07-07SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-06-29SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-05-27SenateReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
2021-05-13SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-13AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 13. Page 1402.)
2021-05-06AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 5).
2021-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2021-03-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-03-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-25AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and P. & C.P.
2021-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2021-02-18AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code56.05Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code56.107Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code56.35Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code791.02Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code791.29Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB1184
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB1184#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB1184#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB1184#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB1184#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB1184#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB1184#94ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB1184#93CHP
Roll Callhttp://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB1184

Bill Comments

feedback