CA AB1183 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 380, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 4.4 (commencing with Section 1450) to Division 2 of the Fish and Game Code, relating to desert conservation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Desert Conservation Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-07 - Assembly - AB 1183 Ramos Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 53 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1183 Ramos By Roth (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1183 Ramos Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 380, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-28 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-13 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2021-09-07AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 14.).
2021-09-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-09-02SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 5.).
2021-08-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 26).
2021-08-16SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-07-12SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-08SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 8).
2021-06-24SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2021-06-09SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2021-06-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 13.)
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 20).
2021-05-20AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
2021-05-19AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-05-10AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-04-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2021-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2021-02-18AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Fish and Game Code1450New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback