CA AB1182 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 3000, 3001, and 3456 of the Penal Code, relating to postrelease supervision of offenders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Post-release supervision of offenders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2019-05-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-04-01AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2019-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code3000Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code3001Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code3456Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback