CA AB1181 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 23083.5, 23320, 23320.5, 24042.5, 24044.5, and 24048 of, and to add and repeal Sections 16005 and 16106 of, the Business and Professions Code, and to add and repeal Section 114381.3 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to fees, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Fees: business licenses: alcoholic beverages: health permits.
Sponsors
Sen. Janet Nguyen [R] | Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R] | Asm. James Gallagher [R] | Sen. Brian Jones [R] |
Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Sen. Rosilicie Ochoa Bogh [R] | Asm. Jim Patterson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and HEALTH. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 16005 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 16106 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 23083.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 23320 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 23320.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 24042.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 24044.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 24048 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 114381.3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |