CA AB1180 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 617, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 617, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2 of the Los Angeles County Flood Control Act (Chapter 755 of the Statutes of 1915), relating to the Los Angeles County Flood Control District.
Title
Los Angeles County Flood Control District: taxes, fees, and charges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-13 - Assembly - AB 1180 HOLDEN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 46 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1180 Holden et al. By Hernandez (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1180 HOLDEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 25 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1180 Holden et al. By Hernandez (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1180 HOLDEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 25 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 617, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 46. Noes 30. Page 3311.). |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (September 12). |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 2338.). |
2017-08-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 19). |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 25. Page 1995.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (May 26). |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 17). |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and E.S. & T.M. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25253.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 42885 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42888.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 42889 | Amended Code | Citation Text |