CA AB1179 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 6 (commencing with Section 2950) to Chapter 2 of Division 3 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employer provided benefit: backup childcare.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-05AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2021-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2021-02-18AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code2950New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback