CA AB1178 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 526, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 526, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11713.3 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 3050, 3050.1, and 3050.7 of, and to add and repeal Article 6 (commencing with Section 3085) to Chapter 6 of Division 2 of, the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: manufacturers and distributors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-10 - Assembly - AB 1178 ACHADJIAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1178 Achadjian By Wieckowski (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Assembly - AB 1178 ACHADJIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1178 Achadjian By Wieckowski (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Assembly - AB 1178 ACHADJIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 526, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3068.). |
2015-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2642.). |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14). |
2015-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1907.) |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1760.) |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 6). |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 11713.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 3050 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 3050.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 3050.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 3085 | New Code | See Bill Text |