CA AB1177 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 451, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Title 21.1 (commencing with Section 100100) of the Government Code, relating to financial institutions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Public Banking Option Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 1177 Santiago Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 51 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1177 Santiago et al. By Hueso (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Labor, Public Employment and Retirement ] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1177 Santiago Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 24 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-04 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 451, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-04 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-20 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2021-09-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 24.).
2021-09-08AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2021-09-08SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9.).
2021-09-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-09-03SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
2021-08-16SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-07-07SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-06SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 5).
2021-06-24SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2021-06-23SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L., P.E. & R. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 23).
2021-06-14SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
2021-06-09 Action rescinded whereby the bill was referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-06-09SenateReferred to Coms. on B. & F.I., L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
2021-06-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 24.)
2021-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20).
2021-05-12AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-05-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-05-04AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2021-05-03AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (April 29).
2021-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & F.
2021-04-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & F.
2021-03-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & F.
2021-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2021-02-18AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code100100New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback