CA AB1177 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 65913.4 of the Government Code, relating to housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Planning and zoning: housing development: streamlined approval.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-03AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2020-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2019-04-24AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-03-25AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2019-03-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
2019-03-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and NAT. RES.
2019-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2019-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65913.4Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback