CA AB1177 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 704, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 1204.2 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to primary care clinics.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Primary care clinics: written transfer agreements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-10 - Assembly - AB 1177 GOMEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 52 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1177 Gomez By Mitchell (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Assembly - AB 1177 GOMEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-10-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 704, Statutes of 2015.
2015-10-09 Approved by the Governor.
2015-09-18AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2015-09-10AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 28. Page 3067.).
2015-09-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2015-09-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 2632.).
2015-09-08SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-09-04SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2015-08-25SenateMeasure version as amended on August 24 corrected. Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-08-24SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. Measure version as amended on August 24 corrected.
2015-08-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-08-17SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2015-07-16SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 15). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-07-08SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2015-05-21SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2015-05-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-05-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 1388.)
2015-05-07AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-05-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 6).
2015-04-29AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2015-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-03-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2015-03-02AssemblyRead first time.
2015-03-01AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
2015-02-27AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1204.2Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1177&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_bill_20150227_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_bill_20150708_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_bill_20150716_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_bill_20150824_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_bill_20150904_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_bill_20150914_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_bill_20151009_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_vote_20150421_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_vote_20150506_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_vote_20150511_0136PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_vote_20150715_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_vote_20150909_0507PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_vote_20150910_1216PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback