CA AB1177 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 596, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 8698, 8698.1, 8698.3, and 8698.6 of, and to add Section 8698.4 to, the Business and Professions Code, and to add Section 15204.6 to the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to structural fumigation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Structural fumigation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1177 Bocanegra By Lieu (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1177 BOCANEGRA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 69 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - AB 1177 BOCANEGRA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-10-05 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 596, Statutes of 2013.
2013-10-05 Approved by the Governor.
2013-09-26AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2013-09-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3227.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 5. Page 3240.).
2013-09-11SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 2333.).
2013-09-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-09-06SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-08-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-08-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
2013-08-19SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2013-08-13SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-08-12SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2013-07-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-06-25SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2013-06-11SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2013-06-06SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2013-05-24SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 1. Page 1591.)
2013-05-13AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 8).
2013-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-04-09AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2013-03-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
2013-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2013-02-24AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
2013-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1177&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_bill_20130222_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_bill_20130625_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_bill_20130813_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_bill_20130906_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_bill_20130918_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_bill_20131005_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_vote_20130423_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_vote_20130508_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_vote_20130524_0912AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_vote_20130701_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_vote_20130826_000004_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_vote_20130911_0627PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_vote_20130911_1139AM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback