CA AB1177 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-22 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 8260) to Division 8 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to homelessness.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homelessness: Interagency Council on Homelessness.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Transportation and Housing (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1177 FONG Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Human Services (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-22 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-08-27 In committee: Held under submission.
2009-08-17 In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
2009-07-09 Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-07-08 From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (July 7).
2009-06-30 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2009-06-24 From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 23).
2009-06-18 Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and T. & H.
2009-06-04 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2009-06-03 Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 29. Page 2044.)
2009-06-02 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-06-01 Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2009-05-29 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
2009-05-20 In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2009-04-29 From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 28).
2009-04-22 From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (April 21).
2009-04-20 Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2009-04-16 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2009-04-01 Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2009-03-31 Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and HUM. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2009-03-02 Read first time.
2009-03-01 From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
2009-02-27 Introduced. To print.

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1177&sess=0910&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_bill_20090227_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_bill_20090331_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_bill_20090416_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_bill_20090601_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_bill_20090630_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_bill_20090709_amended_sen_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_bill_20100322_amended_sen_v93.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_vote_20090421_000003_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_vote_20090428_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_vote_20090528_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_vote_20090603_0400PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_vote_20090623_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_vote_20090707_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1177_vote_20090817_000001_sen_comm.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback