CA AB1175 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 187, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 9873 and 19170 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to consumer affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bureau of Electronic and Appliance Repair, Home

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-07-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1175 Ridley-Thomas By Hill (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Assembly - AB 1175 RIDLEY-THOMAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-12 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 187, Statutes of 2015.
2015-08-12 Approved by the Governor.
2015-08-03AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2015-07-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2015-07-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 1876.).
2015-06-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-06-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 22).
2015-06-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-05-21SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2015-05-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-05-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 1387.)
2015-05-07AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-05-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 6).
2015-04-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-04-15AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2015-04-14AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2015-03-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2015-03-02AssemblyRead first time.
2015-03-01AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
2015-02-27AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code19170Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code9873Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1175&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1175_bill_20150227_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1175_bill_20150414_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1175_bill_20150713_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1175_bill_20150812_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1175_vote_20150421_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1175_vote_20150506_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1175_vote_20150511_0135PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1175_vote_20150608_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1175_vote_20150622_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1175_vote_20150709_1000AM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback